judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BEALE VS. BEALE

Case Information: 34862
Short Caption:BEALE VS. BEALECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - DV9800718Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:11/22/1999How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/21/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
09/21/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-09001
09/21/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days
10/04/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Gary A. Beale--check no. 101.
10/15/1999Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. Myra A. Sheehan no longer represents Mrs. Beale. 99-10035
11/03/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Original record due: 30 days. fn1--[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] 99-10760
11/22/1999Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal. Mailed on 11/18/99. 99-11609
11/22/1999Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
11/24/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice from attorney Myra Sheehan enclosing copy of Withdrawal of Attorney filed in district court on September 21, 1999. 99-11790
01/12/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 00-00545
02/08/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. Returned Record on Appeal. 00-01968
02/08/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
02/23/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 16, 2000. 00-01968