judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

RICHARD ROBERT DEMES v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-08-0226)
Case Number:S-08-0226Case Docketed On:10/13/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against Property 6-3-101 - 6-3-901
Short Title:RICHARD ROBERT DEMES v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:RICHARD ROBERT DEMES, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantRichard Robert DemesDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
David E. Westling
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
10/13/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
10/13/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
10/13/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
11/25/2008Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
11/25/2008Event - Hardcopy received motion for extension of timeEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/26/2008Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
12/17/2008Motion - Dismiss - voluntary with waiverMotionDismiss - voluntary with waiverFinal
12/19/2008Event - Hardcopy received motion for voluntary dismissal of appeal and copy of waiver of appealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/19/2008Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulatedOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
12/19/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal