judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DAVID MEAD V. ANDREW R. POLOTT, TRUSTEE, ET AL

Case Information: 10-CV-1411
Short Caption:DAVID MEAD V. ANDREW R. POLOTT, TRUSTEE, ET ALClassification:Appeals - Civil - Property
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAR6692-10Filed Date:11/02/2010

Opening Event Date:11/02/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:03/02/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/10/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDavid Mead NPro SeN
AppelleeAndrew W. Polott N
Patrick J. Kearney NN
AppelleeGpc DC Properties LLCN
Patrick J. Kearney NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
11/02/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
11/22/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on November 2, 2010, it is ORDERED that appellant shall, within 20 days from the date of this order, complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. If partial transcripts are being ordered, appellant must file a statement of issues to be raised on appeal with this court within 10 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 10 (b)(3)(A). It is FURTHER ORDERED appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (JAC) elp
12/17/2010 On consideration of this court's order of November 22, 2010, directing appellant to file the statement regarding transcript, within 20 days, and it appearing that appellant has failed to comply with the order, it is ORDERED that this appeal is hereby dismissed. See D.C. App. R. 13. (ETW) elp
12/17/2010DISMISSED
01/07/2011MANDATE ISSUED
02/08/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO REINSTATE APPEAL
02/08/2011RECEIVED: Statement Regarding Transcript. (transcript is already here)
02/16/2011APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION - to aplt's motion to re-instate
03/02/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (87-pgs/tape 10/29/10 proc.)w/cd
03/02/2011RECORD COMPLETED
03/07/2011RECORD INDEX
03/07/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion to reinstate, the opposition thereto, and the mandate issued by this court on January 7, 2011, and it appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED, sua sponte, that the mandate issued by this court on January 7, 2011, is hereby recalled. It is
03/07/2011MANDATE RECALLED
03/07/2011 FURTHER ORDERED that the motion is granted and this appeal is hereby reinstated. It is (more)
03/07/2011 FURTHER ORDERED that appellant's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellees' brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (ETW) elp
04/20/2011 On consideration of this court's order of March 7, 2011, directing appellant to file the brief and the appendix within 40 days and it appearing that the brief and the appendix have not been filed, it is ORDERED that the brief of appellant and the appendix shall be submitted within 20 days from the date of this order, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the documents or to request an extension of time within which to do so. Failure to comply with this order shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice. See D.C. App. R. 13. (JAC) elp
05/18/2011 On consideration of this court's order of April 20, 2011, directing appellant to submit the brief and the appendix, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time, and it appearing that the appellant has failed to comply with the order, it is ORDERED that this appeal is hereby dismissed. See D.C. App. R. 13. (ETW) elp
05/18/2011DISMISSED
06/10/2011MANDATE ISSUED