judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-981
B-981
06/24/1968
Application for Writ of Error
RAILROAD COMMISSION OF TEXAS, ET AL.
JAMES F. MILLER, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
10/28/1968Brief on the MeritsRespondent
07/05/1968Response to PetitionRespondent
06/24/1968Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
12/04/1968Opinion issued
10/28/1968Brief on the Merits
10/02/1968Document received (See Remarks)
10/02/1968Document received (See Remarks)
10/02/1968Document received (See Remarks)
10/02/1968Document received (See Remarks)
10/02/1968Document received (See Remarks)
10/02/1968Document received (See Remarks)
07/05/1968Response to Petition
06/24/1968Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
06/24/1968Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Railroad Commission of Texas, et al.Petitioner
James F. Miller, et al.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information