judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 9th Court Of Appeals

Case: 09-81-00046-CR
09-81-00046-CR
09/24/1981
Theft
Jackson, Jr., Basil Bert
Texas, The State of
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/16/1982Mandate Issued
12/30/1981Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/12/1981Brief Filed
10/08/1981Brief Filed
09/24/1981Transcript & SOF Filed (Crim)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/16/1982Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
252nd District Court
Jefferson
38758
8 Years