judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 10th Court Of Appeals

Case: 10-81-00039-CR
10-81-00039-CR
09/23/1981
Attempted Capital Murder
Otis Helms
State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/20/1982Case stored
09/20/1982Mandate issued by this Court
04/15/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
12/03/1981Submitted
09/23/1981Notice of Appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/20/2082Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
66th District Court
Hill
27030
90 Years