judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 9th Court Of Appeals

Case: 09-81-00047-CR
09-81-00047-CR
09/24/1981
Robbery
Johnson, Maurice
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/24/1982Mandate Issued
01/06/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/12/1981Brief Filed
10/05/1981Brief Filed
09/24/1981Transcript & SOF Filed (Crim)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/24/1982Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court
Jefferson
Honorable Larry Gist
38817
20 Years