judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JOHNSON (SAMMY) VS. STATE

Case Information: 31133
Short Caption:JOHNSON (SAMMY) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 38541 , 40577 , 63195
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C126826Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:MaupinCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:02/25/1998How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/02/1997Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
10/02/1997Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.
10/02/1997OtherDisqualification of Justice Maupin. (Sat in district court proceedings.)
10/21/1997Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. The clerk of the district court shall transmit to the clerk of this court a certified copy of the complete trial court record in each of the above-identified appeals, as well as any previously prepared transcripts of the district court proceedings. Record due: 120 days. fn1--[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 30992, 30993, 31133, 31152, 31154, 31177.
02/25/1998Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 and 2.
02/25/1998Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
04/22/1998Other Incoming DocumentReceived Proper Person Document. Request to Add Supplemental Brief. (Received original only.)
04/30/1998MotionReceived Proper Person Motion. NRAP 27 belated Opening Brief extension of time requested and requesting leave to proceed in filing with permission of the Nevada Supreme Court, pursuant to NRAP 46(b); 26(b); 28(A); 31(A,D); 24(A). Received the original and 2 copies - 1 returned to Appellant.)
06/01/1998BriefReceived Proper Person Brief. Appellant Sammy Lewis Johnson's Opening Brief. (Received the original and 2 copies - 1 returned to Appellant.)
06/16/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "Order this appeal dismissed." fn3[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] SNP99B - RR/MS/NB
07/12/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur.
08/23/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 11, 2000.