judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

FELIX NAJERA v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-08-0203)
Case Number:S-08-0203Case Docketed On:09/17/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Carbon CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:FELIX NAJERA v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:FELIX NAJERA, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantFelix NajeraDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Eric M. Alden
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Leda M. Pojman

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law, Criminal Law -Sentencing
Opinion Number:2009 WY 105
Citation:214 P.3d 990

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
09/17/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
09/17/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from DC but no NOA receivedNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from DC but no NOA receivedFinal
09/17/2008Order - Sanction - notice of appealOrderSanction - notice of appealFinal
09/17/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
10/10/2008Fees - Sanctions received - NOAFeesSanctions received - NOAFinal
11/04/2008Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
11/04/2008Event - Hardcopy received - brief of appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/16/2008Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
12/17/2008Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppelleeEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/06/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
01/14/2009Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
01/14/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, five volumes. Volumes I-II, Original Papers; Volumes III-IV, Transcripts; Volume V, Confidential Folder & Cassette Tape.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
02/11/2009Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
02/13/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Eric M. Alden for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
02/17/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Leda M. Pojman for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
03/18/2009Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Eric M. Alden, Senior Assistant Appellate Counsel for appellant; Leda M. Pojman, Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
03/18/2009Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
08/21/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming in part and reversing in part, Justice Burke writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
08/25/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card. Opinion signed for 8/24/09 by agent for Warden of Wyoming State Penitentiary.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
09/09/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
09/09/2009Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
09/09/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
09/09/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
09/11/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card. Mandate signed for by agent for Warden at WSP.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
09/30/2009Event - Phone Call. Called the District Court Clerk's office and spoke with Lee. They did receive the record back as it was on their shelf and they had the mandate. We never received the green certified mail card back from the post office.EventPhone CallFinal