judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 9th Court Of Appeals

Case: 09-81-00044-CR
09-81-00044-CR
09/24/1981
Other Felony
Shannon, Ted. R.
Texas, The State of
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/19/1982Mandate Issued
06/30/1982Petition for ReviewMotion or Writ Denied
05/10/1982Petition for Review
03/08/1982Motion for Rehearing FiledOverruled
02/24/1982Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
12/07/1981Brief Filed
10/30/1981Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
10/23/1981Brief Filed
09/24/1981Transcript & SOF Filed (Crim)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/19/1982Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court
Jefferson
Honorable Larry Gist
38217
10 Years