judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ANDERSON (JOSEPH) VS. STATE

Case Information: 34620
Short Caption:ANDERSON (JOSEPH) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 35251
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR982435Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/04/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/04/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-07178
09/09/1999Order/CounselFiled Order/Remand for Designation of Counsel. If appellant is indigent, the district court shall have 30 days to appoint counsel for appellant. Otherwise, the district court shall order that, within 30 days, appellant must retain counsel and counsel must enter an appearance in the district court. Within 5 days from the appointment or appearance of counsel, the district court clerk shall: (1) transmit to this court a copy of the district court's written or minute order; and (2) serve a copy of this order of remand on appellant's counsel. Thereafter, counsel shall have 10 days to enter an appearance with this court. fn1[All filing deadlines shall commence to run from the date on which counsel is required, under this order, to enter an appearance in this court]. 99-08496
11/03/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Documents from District Court Clerk. The Court does hereby appoint Scott Edwards to represent appellant in this appeal. 99-10747
12/17/1999MotionFiled Motion. Motion for Stay of Proceedings, Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel and Leave to File late Docketing Statement and Request for Transcripts. 99-12819
01/04/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The clerk shall correct this administrative error by formally designating Edwards as appellant's counsel of record in Docket No. 34620, and by removing Edwards as counsel of record in Docket No. 35251. fn1[In Docket No. 34620, all filing deadlines shall commence to run from the date of this order]. The district court shall also correct its records to reflect that Edwards is appellant's appointed counsel in case number CR98-2435 not in district court case number CR98-P2435. Unless appellant voluntarily withdraws the appeal in the manner set forth above, or this court otherwise orders, Docket No. 35251 shall hereafter proceed as a proper person appeal. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant in Docket No. 34620). Nos. 34620, 35251. 00-00107
01/10/2000Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. May 1-5, 1999 Transcripts requested: To Court Reporter: Kristine A. Bokelmann. 00-00399
01/18/2000Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 00-00821
02/01/2000TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: May 3, 4, and 5, 1999. Court Reporter: Karen Yates. 00-01631
04/03/2000BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: 3/30/00. 00-05285
04/03/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 00-05286
04/20/2000BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: 4/19/00. 00-06378
05/05/2000BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 5/5/00 (Reno/Carson). 00-07410
10/03/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. Having considered appellant's contentions and concluded that they lack merit, " . . . we affirm the judgment of conviction." NNP00A-MS/DA/ML 00-17426
10/31/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-17520
10/31/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/29/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 2, 2000. 00-17520