judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS OF TETON COUNTY, WYOMING v. THOMAS L. CROW and CAROL-ANN CROW, JAMES E. MOELLER and SOUTHPAC TRUST INTERNATIONAL INC., Trustees of the TLC/CGC Trust

Case Heading (S-07-0031)
Case Number:S-07-0031Case Docketed On:02/07/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Teton CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Counties (Title 18)
Short Title:BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS OF TETON COUNTY, WYOMING v. THOMAS L. CROW and CAROL-ANN CROW, JAMES E. MOELLER and SOUTHPAC TRUST INTERNATIONAL INC., Trustees of the TLC/CGC Trust
Full Title:THE BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS OF TETON COUNTY, WYOMING, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. THOMAS L. CROW and CAROL-ANN CROW, JAMES E. MOELLER and SOUTHPAC TRUST INTERNATIONAL INC., Trustees of the TLC/CGC Trust, Appellees (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantThe Board of County Commissioners of Teton County, WyomingJames L. Radda
AppelleeThomas L. CrowBradford S. Mead
Timothy K. Newcomb
Katherine Lamere Mead
AppelleeCarol-Ann CrowBradford S. Mead
Timothy K. Newcomb
Katherine Lamere Mead
AppelleeJames E. MoellerBradford S. Mead
Timothy K. Newcomb
Katherine Lamere Mead
AppelleeSouthpac Trust International, Inc.Bradford S. Mead
Timothy K. Newcomb
Katherine Lamere Mead
AppelleeTLC/CGC TrustBradford S. Mead
Timothy K. Newcomb
Katherine Lamere Mead

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Other, Property - Real
Opinion Number:2007 WY 177
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
02/07/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
02/07/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
02/07/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
02/07/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
03/26/2007Brief - Appellant; and received copy of brief on disk.BriefAppellantFinal
04/02/2007Notice-Incoming - Other. Received amended index from Clerk of District Court.Notice-IncomingOtherFinal
05/14/2007Brief - Appellee; received copy of designation of record on appeal and brief on diskBriefAppelleeFinal
05/23/2007Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
05/29/2007Brief - Appellant reply; received copy of brief on cdBriefAppellant replyFinal
05/29/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
06/04/2007Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
06/06/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk, four volumes. Volumes I & II, Original Papers; Volume III, Exhibits; Volume IV, TranscriptsRecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
06/06/2007Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
11/05/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Hill writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
11/21/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
11/21/2007Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
11/21/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
11/21/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
12/03/2007Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 11/26/07 by E. Johnson.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal