judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MILLER, WILLIE UNITED STATES

Case Information: 80-CF-0430
Short Caption:MILLER, WILLIE UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Homicide
Lead:80-CF-0430Consolidated: 82-CF-1046
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:Filed Date:04/14/1980

Opening Event Date:04/14/1980Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:11/04/1980Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:06/23/1981
Argued/Submitted:11/08/1983
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901MILLER, WILLIE UNITED STATES
04/14/1980FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
11/04/1980FiledRecord Completed
06/23/1981FiledBriefing Completed
11/08/1983FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
06/29/1984FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition