judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals

Case: 08-81-00101-CR
08-81-00101-CR
09/23/1981
Other Felony
Lang, Robert George
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/04/1984Shuck purged
12/20/1982Mandate Issued
10/13/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/13/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/13/1982Submission
10/13/1982Submitted
08/02/1982Submitted
08/02/1982Case ready to be set
07/07/1982Submission
09/23/1981Record filed.
09/23/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/20/1982Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownCriminal - State of Texas
UnknownCriminal - Appellant
Trial Court Information
34th District Court
El Paso
Honorable Jerry Woodard
31657-34
2 to 6 years