judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals

Case: 14-81-00681-CR
14-81-00681-CR
09/23/1981
Theft
Polhemus, James Arthur
Texas, The State of
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/12/1984Mandate Issued
03/08/1984Opinion issuedABATED
11/28/1983Record RETURNED from Higher Court
11/23/1983Petition for Discretionary ReviewGRANTED
08/05/1983Petition for Discretionary Review
07/15/1983Petition for Discretionary Review
06/13/1983Mandate Issued
06/09/1983Opinion issuedABATED
06/02/1983Submission
05/05/1983No description available.OTHERWISE DISPOSED
04/29/1983No description available.
03/10/1983AM CUR, OTHER,
02/28/1983Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
11/23/1982Record Filed (Both records FILED)
03/04/1982Extend time to file record FILED-ANT,APEDENIED
09/23/1981Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/12/1984Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - Appellant
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - Appellant
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
232nd District Court
Harris
341,508
10 yrs.