judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 9th Court Of Appeals

Case: 09-81-00011-CV
09-81-00011-CV
09/25/1981
Miscellaneous civil
Logan, Bonnie
First Bank of Houston, Texas, et al
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/01/1982Mandate Issued
05/27/1982Case Returned from Higher Ct.
03/05/1982Writ DisposedRefused
02/23/1982Case Forwarded to Higher Court
02/17/1982Writ Filed
01/14/1982Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
12/03/1981Motion for Rehearing Filed
11/24/1981Opinion issuedDismissed
09/25/1981No Description Available.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/01/1982Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
258th District Court
San Jacinto
Honorable Joe Ned Dean
6697