judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals

Case: 04-81-00303-CR
04-81-00303-CR
09/25/1981
Involuntary Manslaughter
Talamantes, Henry
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/14/2014Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
11/04/1982Mandate Executed By The Trial Court
10/26/1982Mandate Issued
10/26/1982Mandate Issued
06/30/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/30/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/19/1982Submission
05/19/1982Submission
05/19/1982Submitted
02/24/1982Mot-Oral Argument DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/10/1982Mot-Oral Argument Filed
01/26/1982Record Filed
01/22/1982Brief Filed
12/30/1981Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/28/1981Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
11/30/1981Brief Filed
09/25/1981Notice of Appeal Filed
09/25/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/14/2014Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
175th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable James E. Barlow
81-CR-0793
3 years