judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals

Case: 04-81-00304-CR
04-81-00304-CR
09/24/1981
Burglary
Castaneda, Domingo Acosta
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/09/1983Mandate Executed By The Trial Court
06/09/1983Mandate Issued
06/09/1983Mandate Issued
04/20/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/20/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
11/17/1982Submission
11/17/1982Submission
11/17/1982Submitted
04/21/1982Motion for Reconsideration DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/02/1982Case ready to be set
04/02/1982Brief Filed
04/02/1982Case ready to be set
03/13/1982Brief Filed
03/03/1982Motion for Reconsideration Filed
02/18/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
02/09/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
01/25/1982Motion for Reconsideration DisposedMotion Granted in Part
01/15/1982Motion for Reconsideration Filed
01/05/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
12/31/1981Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
12/10/1981Record Filed
09/24/1981Notice of appeal received
09/24/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/01/2013Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
06/09/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
175th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable ROY R. BARRERA, SR.
81-CR-1721
Life