judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals

Case: 04-81-00300-CR
04-81-00300-CR
09/24/1981
Burglary
Adame, Guadalupe
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/14/2014Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
12/09/1982Mandate Issued
12/09/1982Motion for Leave DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/09/1982Mandate Issued
12/06/1982Motion for Leave Filed
11/29/1982Motion to Withdraw Appeal DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/29/1982Motion to Withdraw Appeal DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/23/1982Motion to Withdraw Appeal Filed
09/24/1981Case ready to be set
09/24/1981Brief Filed
09/24/1981Brief Filed
09/24/1981Record Filed
09/24/1981Case ready to be set
09/24/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/14/2014Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
187th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Pat Priest
80-CR-3153
6 years