judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-978
B-978
06/19/1968
Application for Writ of Error
PARKDALE STATE BANK, AMERICAN COFFEE COMPANY AND PELS QUALITY HOMES, INC.
J. E. MCCORD, DBA MCCORD WHOLESALE
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
10/18/1968Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
10/18/1968Motion for RehearingPetitioner
09/19/1968Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
07/01/1968Response to PetitionRespondent
06/19/1968Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
10/22/1968Response to Motion filed
10/18/1968Amicus Curiae Brief received
10/18/1968Motion for RehearingOverruled
09/19/1968Amicus Curiae Brief received
07/01/1968Response to Petition
06/19/1968Application for Writ of Error - Filed
06/19/1968Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Parkdale State Bank, American Coffee Company and Pels Quality Homes, Inc.Petitioner
J. E. McCord, dba McCord WholesaleRespondent
Texas Bankers Association and joining Texas Mortgage Bankers Association and Texas Association of Home Builders, Inc.Amicus Curiae
Martin HarrisAmicus Curiae
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information