judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 9th Court Of Appeals

Case: 09-81-00010-CV
09-81-00010-CV
09/24/1981
Miscellaneous civil
Gray, Leonard C.
Southern Pacific Transportation Co. of Texas and La.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/29/1982Case stored
04/29/1982Mandate Issued
02/18/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
02/04/1982Submitted
01/18/1982Brief Filed
12/15/1981Brief Filed
10/30/1981Statement of Facts Filed
09/24/1981Transcript Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/29/1982Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
163rd District Court
Orange
Honorable David A. Dunn
B22909