judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-980
B-980
06/20/1968
Application for Writ of Error
DON J. LIGON, ET UX.
E.F. HUTTON AND COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
10/29/1968Supplement to Motion for RehearingPetitioner
10/17/1968Motion for RehearingPetitioner
07/16/1968Reply to ResponsePetitioner
07/03/1968Response to PetitionRespondent
06/20/1968Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
10/29/1968Supplement to Motion for Rehearing
10/17/1968Motion for RehearingOverruled
07/16/1968Reply to Response
07/03/1968Response to Petition
06/20/1968Application for Writ of Error - Filed
06/20/1968Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
E.F. Hutton and CompanyRespondent
Don J. Ligon, et ux.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information