judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 9th Court Of Appeals

Case: 09-81-00043-CR
09-81-00043-CR
09/24/1981
Other Felony
Williams, Fred Donley
Texas, The State of
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/29/1982Mandate Issued
11/03/1982Petition for ReviewMotion or Writ Denied
09/03/1982Petition for Review
06/28/1982Motion for Rehearing FiledOverruled
06/16/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
12/14/1981Brief Filed
11/23/1981Brief Filed
09/24/1981Transcript & SOF Filed (Crim)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/29/1982Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court
Jefferson
Honorable Larry Gist
37811-R
Life