judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LAYTON (JOHN) VS. STATE C/W 32127 FOR DISPOSITION

Case Information: 30799
Short Caption:LAYTON (JOHN) VS. STATE C/W 32127 FOR DISPOSITIONCourt:Supreme Court
Consolidated:30799*, 32127 Related Case(s): 32127
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - 262387Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:10/03/1997How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/25/1997Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/25/1997Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.
08/07/1997MotionReceived Proper Person Motion. Motion for Order Remanding Jurisdiction back to District Court.
08/08/1997Other Incoming DocumentReceived Proper Person Document. Proper Person Exhibits A, B, C, & D.
09/08/1997Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Having reviewed the documents on file in these Proper Person appeals, this court has concluded that its review of the complete records is warranted. Within 120 days from the date of this order, the clerk of the district court shall transmit to the clerk of this court a certified copy of the complete trial court record in each of the above-identified appeals, as well as any previously prepared transcripts of the district court proceedings. fn1--[The records shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] (Nos. 30769, 30770, 30793, 30799, 30800, 30870, 30895, 30921, 30957).
10/01/1997MotionReceived Proper Person Motion. Proper Person Ex Parte Motion for Appointment of Counsel; Motion for Leave to file Ex Parte Motion for Appointment of Counsel; Request for Submission. (2 originals of each document.)
10/03/1997Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1, 2, and 3.
10/03/1997Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
10/16/1997MotionReceived Proper Person Motion. Motion for Court to take Judicial Notice. (Received original and one copy).
12/26/1997MotionReceived Proper Person Motion. Motion to put the Appellant's appeal in abeyance; Request for Submission. (Original only.)
01/07/1998MotionReceived Proper Person Motion. Motion for Order setting briefing schedule.
01/16/1998MotionReceived Proper Person Motion. Motion for Order Remanding Jurisdiction back to District Court.
04/15/1998MotionReceived Proper Person Motion. Motion for Order Remanding Jurisdiction back to District Court (received the original and 1 copy).
09/16/1998MotionReceived Proper Person Motion. Motion for Leave to file Opening Brief. (Received original and two copies - one copy returned.)
09/16/1998BriefReceived Proper Person Brief. Appellant's Opening Brief. (Received original and two copies.)
06/16/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. We elect to consolidate these appeals for disposition. Having reviewed the records on appeal, and for the reasons set forth above, we conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER these appeals dismissed." fn2[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] SNP99B-RR/MS/NB. Nos. 30799, 32127.
06/30/2000MotionReceived Proper Person Motion. Request for Leave to File Petition for Rehearing. (Original and 2 copies--one copy returned.) Nos. 30799, 32121.
06/30/2000Other Incoming DocumentReceived Proper Person Document. Petition for Rehearing. (Original and 2 copies--one copy returned.) Nos. 30799, 32121.
07/25/2000Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." fn1[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] SNP99B-RR/MS/NB.
08/10/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-13883
08/10/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/15/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 11, 2000. 00-13883
08/21/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. On July 26, 2000, this court received a motion to supplement petition for rehearing. Cause appearing, appellant's motion is denied as moot (nos. 30799/32127). 00-14558
10/18/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Notice from U.S. Supreme Court\Certiorari Denied. A petition for a writ of certiorari was filed October 11, 2000, and placed on the docket as Case No. 00-6508. "MISSING." 00-18486
12/01/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Notice from U.S. Supreme Court\Certiorari Granted. The petition for a writ of ceritorari is denied. (No action required.) nos. 30799/32127. 00-20962