judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DEAN VONKROSIGK v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-08-0197)
Case Number:S-08-0197Case Docketed On:09/03/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Criminal Procedure (Title 7)
Short Title:DEAN VONKROSIGK v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:DEAN VONKROSIGK, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantDean Vonkrosigk Pro Se
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Leda M. Pojman

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
09/03/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
09/03/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
09/03/2008Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
09/03/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
09/25/2008Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
10/06/2008Motion - Dismiss - involuntaryMotionDismiss - involuntaryFinal
10/06/2008Motion - Stay briefing - opposedMotionStay briefing - opposedFinal
10/07/2008Event - Hardcopy received - motion to dismiss appeal and motion to stay briefingEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/15/2008Record - Received unfiled record from attorney generalRecordReceived unfiled recordFinal
10/29/2008Response/Objection - Motion to dismissResponse/ObjectionMotionFinal
11/04/2008Order - Dismiss - involuntaryOrderDismiss - involuntaryFinal
11/20/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal