judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

TERRI THOMPSON MALLETT V. TOTAL HOME RENOVATION, INC., ET AL

Case Information: 10-CV-1365
Short Caption:TERRI THOMPSON MALLETT V. TOTAL HOME RENOVATION, INC., ET ALClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB6400-08Filed Date:10/29/2010

Opening Event Date:10/29/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/10/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantTerri Thompson Mallett NPro SeN
AppelleeTotal Home Renovation Inc.N
John R. TjadenNN
AppelleeChukwemeke Chico Akwara N
John R. TjadenNN
AppelleeMitty Akwara N
John R. TjadenNN
AppelleeObiajuru Andrew Akwara N
John R. TjadenNN
AppelleeVenetta Sloane-Akwara N
John R. TjadenNN
AppelleeAndrew's Partition & Restoration Inc.N
John R. TjadenNN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
10/29/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL****AMENDED NOA FILED 1/14/11 LW
11/18/2010 ORDERED that APPELLANT shall, W/N 20 DAYS from the date of this order, SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be dismissed for having been taken from a NON-APPELABLE order. See DC Code 11-721 (2001);... (BY: ETW)
11/18/2010TMC - OTSC - ROTSC - AMENDED NOA
12/08/2010RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
01/19/2011 ORDERED that the Clerk shall file the AMENDED NOA. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the APPEAL IS HEREBY DISMISSED as having een taken from NON-FINAL ORDERS...SEE HARDCOPY
01/19/2011DISMISSED
02/10/2011MANDATE ISSUED