judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-2512
A-2512
01/16/1950
Application for Writ of Error
C. L. BLANKS
SOUTHLAND HOTEL, INCORPORATED
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
04/13/1950Motion for RehearingRespondent
03/04/1950Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
02/28/1950Errata FiledPetitioner
01/26/1950Response to PetitionRespondent
01/16/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
04/18/1950Response to Motion filed
04/13/1950Additional Copies received
04/13/1950Motion for Rehearing
03/29/1950Opinion issued
03/04/1950Supplemental Brief filed
02/28/1950Errata Filed
02/08/1950Document received (See Remarks)
02/08/1950Document received (See Remarks)
01/26/1950Response to Petition
01/16/1950Application for Writ of Error - Filed
01/16/1950Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
C. L. BlanksPetitioner
Southland Hotel, IncorporatedRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information