judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JACKSON VS. STATE

Case Information: 32933
Short Caption:JACKSON VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 37454
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C146690Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:12/21/1999How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/31/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/31/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)
09/08/1998TranscriptFiled Transcript. Transcript of Proceedings. Court Reporter: Cathy Nelson.
09/09/1998Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.
09/14/1998Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Court Reporter: Cathy Nelson.
09/14/1998Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Court Reporter: Patsy Smith.
10/07/1998Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Affidavit of Noncompliance with NRAP 9 (b).
11/09/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. We elect to treat court reporter Patsy K. Smith's "Affidavit of Noncompliance with NRAP 9 (b)" as a motion for an extension of time to file the transcript in this matter, and we grant the motion. Reporter Smith shall have to and including November 30, 1998, to prepare, serve and file the requested transcript.
11/23/1998Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Application for Extension of Time from Court Reporter Patsy K. Smith.
12/15/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. Court reporter Smith shall complete and file the requested transcript on or before December 30, 1998. No further extensions of time shall be granted absent extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. Further requests for an extension may result in the imposition of sanctions. Appellant shall have to and including January 29, 1999, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall then proceed in accordance with NRAP 31 (a) (1).
12/23/1998MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Appellant may have to and including January 29, 1999, within which to file the opening brief.
01/06/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. Transcript of Proceedings: 04/23/98; 04/22/98; 04/21/98; and 04/20/98. Court Reporter: Patsy K. Smith.
01/25/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Application for Extension of Time.
02/03/1999Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. Granting Motion. Appellant's January 25, 1999, motion is granted. Appellant shall serve and file the opening brief and appendix on or before April 12, 1999.
04/14/1999BriefFiled Brief. Appellant's Opening Brief. (Mailed on: Express-No postmark).
04/14/1999AppendixFiled Appendix. Appellant's Appendix.
04/26/1999BriefFiled Brief. Respondent's Answering Brief. (Mailed on: Express-No postmark).
05/27/1999MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Appellant shall have to and including June 25, 1999, to file the Reply Brief.
07/06/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Application for Extension of Time.
07/06/1999BriefReceived Brief. Appellant's Reply Brief.
07/07/1999Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. The motion filed July 6, 1999, is granted. The reply brief provisionally submitted on July 6, 1999, shall be filed, forthwith.
07/07/1999BriefFiled Brief. Appellant's Reply Brief. Mailed on: express-no postmark.
12/21/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. Oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Southern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein.
12/21/1999Other Other. Case submitted on the briefs to the Southern Nevada Panel this day. SNP99B-WM/MS/NB.
12/21/1999Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
03/13/2000Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before Maupin, Shearing and Becker, JJ. By the Court, Maupin, J. We concur: Shearing, J. and Becker, J. 116 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 35. SNP99B-WM/MS/NB 00-03873
04/10/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-05645
04/10/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
05/25/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 20, 2000. 00-05645