judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DAVID DALE BAKER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-10-0230)
Case Number:S-10-0230Case Docketed On:10/27/2010
Linked To: S-10-0229
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Criminal Procedure (Title 7)
Short Title:DAVID DALE BAKER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:DAVID DALE BAKER, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantDavid Dale Baker Pro Se
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Jenny Lynn Craig

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Jurisdiction - Subject Matter
Opinion Number:2011 WY 123
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
10/27/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
10/27/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
10/27/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
11/23/2010Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
12/23/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
12/27/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/03/2011Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
01/11/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
01/14/2011Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
01/20/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, four volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II - Transcripts; Volume III, Confidential Folder; Volume IV, Supreme Court Record S-08-0094 (contains six volumes).RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
01/20/2011Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
01/24/2011Event - Rejected Filing - Returned "Traverse to Brief of Appellee" (reply brief) and "Affidavit of David Dale Baker" without filing as they were untimely. Certificate of Service date and postmark were 1/20/2011. Reply brief was due 1/10/2011.EventRejected FilingFinal
01/24/2011Notice-Incoming - Change of address for David Dale BakerNotice-IncomingChange of addressFinal
08/25/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Burke writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
09/12/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
09/12/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
09/12/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
09/12/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
09/14/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 9/13/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal