judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CBM GEOSOLUTIONS, INC., a Wyoming corporation; BRET NOECKER; and BRIAN LAREAU v. GAS SENSING TECHNOLOGY CORP., a Wyoming corporation

Case Heading (S-08-0214)
Case Number:S-08-0214Case Docketed On:10/01/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Albany CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Common Law - Contract
Short Title:CBM GEOSOLUTIONS, INC., a Wyoming corporation; BRET NOECKER; and BRIAN LAREAU v. GAS SENSING TECHNOLOGY CORP., a Wyoming corporation
Full Title:CBM GEOSOLUTIONS, INC., a Wyoming corporation; BRET NOECKER; and BRIAN LAREAU, Appellants (Defendants), v. GAS SENSING TECHNOLOGY CORP., a Wyoming corporation, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantCBM Geosolutions, Inc., a Wyoming corporationPeggy Ann Trent
AppellantBret NoeckerPeggy Ann Trent
AppellantBrian LaReauPeggy Ann Trent
AppelleeGas Sensing Technology Corp., a Wyoming corporationPhilip A. Nicholas
Jason M. Tangeman

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Civil Procedure, Contracts, Injunction
Opinion Number:2009 WY 113
Citation:215 P.3d1054

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
10/01/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
10/01/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from DC but no NOA receivedNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from DC but no NOA receivedFinal
10/01/2008Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
10/01/2008Order - Sanction - notice of appealOrderSanction - notice of appealFinal
10/01/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
10/03/2008Fees - Sanctions received - NOAFeesSanctions received - NOAFinal
11/14/2008Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
11/17/2008Event - Hardcopy received Brief of Appellants and received copy of designation of record on appealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/23/2008Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
12/24/2008Event - Hardcopy received - Appellee's motion for 12 day extension of time within which to file response brief.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/24/2008Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
01/12/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
01/15/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Appellee's Opening BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/02/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
02/04/2009Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
02/04/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
02/04/2009Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
02/11/2009Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
02/17/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Jason M. Tangeman for Gas Sensing Technology Corp.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
02/17/2009Motion - Oral argument - vacateMotionOral argument - vacateFinal
02/18/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Appellee's motion to vacate and continue oral argument.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/18/2009Order - Vacating setting for oral argumentOrderVacating setting for oral argumentFinal
02/19/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Peggy A. Trent for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
03/16/2009Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
03/20/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Peggy Trent for appellants.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
03/24/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Jason Tangeman for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
04/22/2009Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Peggy Ann Trent for appellants; Jason M. Tangeman for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
04/22/2009Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
09/14/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order - affirming, Chief Justice Voigt writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
09/30/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
09/30/2009Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
09/30/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
09/30/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
10/05/2009Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal