judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals

Case: 01-81-00762-CR
01-81-00762-CR
10/26/1981
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Allen, Michael Ray
Texas, The State of
No
Thomson/West
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/29/1984Mandate issued - criminal or civil
09/14/1983No description available.Motion or Writ Denied (inactivated by Hebert 2-8-06)
02/28/1983Opinion issuedOtherwise disposed
01/10/1983No description available.
11/24/1982Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
10/06/1982Submitted
08/26/1982Motion to obtain record disposedMotion or Writ Denied (inactivated by Hebert 2-8-06)
08/13/1982Motion to obtain record (generally pro se)
06/15/1982Brief filed
06/03/1982Supplemental transcript filed
05/04/1982Supplemental transcript filed
03/24/1982Record filed
03/24/1982Record filed
10/19/1981Notice of appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/29/1984Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateCriminal - State of Texas
StateCriminal - Appellant
Trial Court Information
183rd District Court
Harris
338,694
55 years