judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals

Case: 04-81-00366-CV
04-81-00366-CV
10/26/1981
Miscellaneous civil
Priest, Jr., William G.,
First Mortgage Company of Texas, Inc.
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/07/1984Mandate Issued
05/07/1984Mandate Issued
04/30/1984Case Returned from Higher Court
04/04/1984Higher Court DecisionRefused
12/13/1983Case Forwarded to Higher Court
11/17/1983Writ of Error filed
10/18/1983Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
10/05/1983Response to Motion Filed
09/29/1983Motion for Rehearing Filed
09/14/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
09/14/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
03/11/1983Mot. EOT t/file Supp. Transcript DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/10/1983No Description Available.
03/03/1983Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/28/1983Mot. EOT t/file Supp. Transcript Filed
02/14/1983Brief Filed
02/14/1983Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
02/09/1983Submission
02/09/1983Submission
02/09/1983Submitted
12/23/1982Submission Letter Sent
03/11/1982Mot. EOT t/file Supp. Transcript DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/22/1982Requests Oral Argument
02/22/1982Requests Oral Argument
01/29/1982Brief Filed
01/28/1982Mot. EOT t/file Supp. Transcript Filed
12/23/1981Brief Filed
12/23/1981Case ready to be set
12/11/1981Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/11/1981Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
11/19/1981Brief Filed
11/02/1981No Description Available.
10/26/1981No Description Available.
10/26/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
10/21/1981Appeal Bond Filed
08/03/1981Judgment Signed in Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/07/1984Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
225th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Rose Spector
78-CI-2059