judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals

Case: 08-81-00193-CR
08-81-00193-CR
10/27/1981
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Fuentez, Tomas
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/05/1984Shuck purged
06/08/1983Mandate Issued
03/16/1983Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
01/28/1983Submitted
01/12/1983Submission
10/25/1982Brief Filed
10/06/1982Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposed
09/22/1982Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
08/25/1982Brief Filed
08/11/1982Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/30/1982Response to Petition, Motion or Inquiry
07/26/1982Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
07/14/1982Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/28/1982Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
06/09/1982Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/26/1982Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
05/05/1982Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/21/1982Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
03/29/1982Record filed.
03/03/1982No description available.Motion or Writ Granted
02/16/1982No description available.
01/06/1982No description available.Motion or Writ Granted
12/24/1981No description available.
10/27/1981Notice of Appeal Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/08/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownCriminal - State of Texas
UnknownCriminal - Appellant
Trial Court Information
2189
10 yrs.