judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals

Case: 08-81-00208-CR
08-81-00208-CR
10/28/1981
Marijuana Possession
Olivas, Refugio Gonzales
Texas, The State of
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/05/1984Shuck purged
07/28/1983No description available.
07/28/1983Mandate Issued
07/25/1983No description available.
06/17/1983No description available.
05/25/1983No description available.
05/25/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/25/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
12/03/1982Submitted
12/03/1982Submission
12/03/1982Submitted
10/21/1982Supplemental Brief Filed
10/13/1982Submission
08/11/1982Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/11/1982Case ready to be set
08/06/1982No description available.
07/07/1982Submission
05/17/1982Miscellaneous filing
05/05/1982Motion to Withdraw as appeal atty disposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/24/1982Motion to Withdraw as appeal atty filed
10/28/1981Brief Filed
10/28/1981Statement of Facts Filed
10/28/1981Transcript Filed
10/28/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/28/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownCriminal - State of Texas
UnknownCriminal - Appellant
Trial Court Information
112th District Court
Pecos
1130
10 Yrs.