judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals

Case: 08-81-00181-CR
08-81-00181-CR
10/27/1981
Other Felony
Jackson, David Darnell
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/05/1984Shuck purged
12/19/1983No description available.
01/28/1983Mandate Issued
11/24/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
08/06/1982Submitted
07/07/1982Submission
04/01/1982Brief Filed
03/17/1982Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/02/1982Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
02/01/1982Brief Filed
01/07/1982Record filed.
10/27/1981Notice of Appeal Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/28/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownCriminal - State of Texas
UnknownCriminal - Appellant
Trial Court Information
70th District Court
Ector
A-10,467