judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals

Case: 08-81-00199-CR
08-81-00199-CR
10/27/1981
Forgery
Taylor, Pamela
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/05/1984Shuck purged
09/10/1982Mandate Issued
07/14/1982Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/14/1982Opinion issuedDismissed
07/12/1982Motion for Dismissal Filed
07/07/1982Submission
12/02/1981Brief Filed
11/10/1981Statement of Facts Filed
11/10/1981Supplemental Transcript Filed
11/10/1981Transcript Filed
10/27/1981Brief Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/10/1982Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownCriminal - State of Texas
UnknownCriminal - Appellant
Trial Court Information
142nd District Court
Midland
Honorable Vann Culp
CRB-8040
6 yrs.