judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals

Case: 08-81-00198-CR
08-81-00198-CR
10/27/1981
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Shanks, Rex Bradley
Texas, The State of
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/25/1990Shuck purged
03/04/1988Mandate Issued
03/04/1988Mandate Issued
02/17/1988Case Returned from Higher Court
02/17/1988Decision from Supreme Court or CCARefused
03/06/1987Case Forwarded to Higher Court
02/26/1987Petition for Discretionary Review
01/29/1987Fee paid
01/28/1987Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
01/26/1987Fee paid
01/23/1987Payment of fee due requested
01/17/1987Motion for Rehearing Filed
01/13/1987Fee paid
12/31/1986Opinion issuedAffirmed
12/31/1986Payment of fee due requested
12/31/1986Payment of fee due requested
12/31/1986Opinion issuedAffirmed
12/05/1986Submitted
12/05/1986Submission
12/05/1986Submitted
11/14/1986Submission
11/05/1986Brief Filed
11/05/1986Case ready to be set
11/05/1986Filed Ltr re req. for oral argument
11/05/1986Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/05/1986Case ready to be set
10/22/1986Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
09/25/1986Brief Filed
09/25/1986Filed Ltr re req. for oral argument
08/20/1986Order entered
06/20/1986Case Returned from Higher Court
06/18/1986No description available.Otherwise Disposed
06/18/1986Case remanded from higher court
06/05/1984Shuck purged
04/01/1983Decision from Supreme Court or CCAMotion or Writ Granted
01/18/1983Case Forwarded to Higher Court
01/13/1983Petition for Discretionary Review
12/15/1982Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
11/29/1982Brief Filed
11/29/1982Motion for Rehearing Filed
10/27/1982Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/13/1982No description available.
09/15/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
08/03/1982Submitted
07/07/1982Submission
11/05/1981Brief Filed
11/05/1981Record filed.
11/05/1981Supplemental Transcript Filed
10/27/1981Brief Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/04/1988Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownAppellantHon. Emilio Davila, Jr.
UnknownAppellantHon. Michael McLeaish
UnknownAppellantHon. Jim Vollers
UnknownCriminal - State of TexasHon. Al W. Schorre, Jr.
Trial Court Information
142nd District Court
Midland
Honorable Pat M. Baskin
CRA-8113(2)
99 Yrs.