judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals

Case: 08-81-00197-CR
08-81-00197-CR
10/27/1981
Assault or Attempted Murder
Knox, Starlin Leo
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/05/1984Shuck purged
06/30/1982Mandate Issued
04/07/1982Judgment IssuedDismissed
04/07/1982Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/22/1982Motion for Dismissal Filed
12/24/1981Brief Filed
11/10/1981Statement of Facts Filed
11/10/1981Supplemental Transcript Filed
11/10/1981Transcript Filed
10/27/1981Brief Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/30/1982Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownCriminal - Appellant
UnknownCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
142nd District Court
Midland
Honorable Pat M. Baskin
CRA-8148
2 yrs.