judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals

Case: 08-81-00202-CR
08-81-00202-CR
10/27/1981
Robbery
Libby, Theodore A.
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/05/1984Shuck purged
01/28/1983Mandate Issued
11/24/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
11/22/1982Brief Filed
08/06/1982Submitted
07/07/1982Submission
05/12/1982Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
04/28/1982No description available.
03/29/1982Brief Filed
03/10/1982Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/22/1982Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
02/03/1982Record filed.
10/27/1981Notice of Appeal Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/28/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownCriminal - Appellant
UnknownCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
210th District Court
El Paso
Honorable Sam M. Paxson
30968
20 yrs.