judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 9th Court Of Appeals

Case: 09-81-00069-CR
09-81-00069-CR
10/28/1981
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Murphy, Clyde C.
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/04/1984Case stored
12/21/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
01/12/1983Petition for ReviewMotion or Writ Granted
10/29/1982Petition for Review
09/29/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
03/10/1982Submitted
03/10/1982Submission
10/28/1981Brief Filed
10/28/1981Brief Filed
10/28/1981Transcript & SOF Filed (Crim)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/04/1984Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
159th District Court
Angelina
Honorable David Walker
10,373
99 years TDC