judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals

Case: 08-81-00196-CR
08-81-00196-CR
10/28/1981
Theft
Harris, Rickie Charles
Texas, The State of
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/05/1984Shuck purged
03/22/1983Mandate Issued
02/07/1983Case Returned from Higher CourtRefused
10/29/1982Petition for Discretionary Review
09/15/1982Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
04/09/1982Submitted
03/31/1982Submission
11/05/1981Record filed.
11/05/1981Record filed.
10/30/1981Brief Filed
10/27/1981Brief Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/22/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownCriminal - Appellant
UnknownCriminal - State of Texas
UnknownCriminal - State of Texas
UnknownCriminal - Appellant
UnknownCriminal - State of Texas
UnknownCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
142nd District Court
Midland
Honorable Pat M. Baskin
CRA-8545
15 years + $7,500 Fine