judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals

Case: 01-81-00770-CR
01-81-00770-CR
10/27/1981
No description available.
Jones, Michael Clyde
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/20/1984Mandate issued - criminal or civil
12/01/1983Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
12/01/1983Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
01/06/1983Submitted
12/13/1982Submission
09/27/1982Brief filed
07/19/1982Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
07/01/1982Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
04/29/1982Brief filed
03/23/1981Record filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/20/1984Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateCriminal - Appellant
StateCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
12th District Court
Walker
12,358
Life