judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 9th Court Of Appeals

Case: 09-81-00071-CR
09-81-00071-CR
10/28/1981
Other Felony
Gary, Alex Jr. alias Alex Garry, Jr. alias Baba
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/07/1982Mandate Issued
10/20/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
12/10/1981Brief Filed
11/27/1981Brief Filed
10/28/1981Transcript & SOF Filed (Crim)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/07/1982Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No 2
Jefferson
Honorable Gary Sanderson
88763
30 Days in County Jail