judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals

Case: 04-81-00327-CR
04-81-00327-CR
10/26/1981
Marijuana Possession
Acosta, Armando
Texas, The State of
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/14/2014Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
01/14/1983Mandate Executed By The Trial Court
11/23/1982Mandate Issued
11/23/1982Mandate Issued
09/08/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
09/08/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/16/1982Submission
06/16/1982Submission
06/16/1982Submitted
01/29/1982Supplemental Brief Filed
01/06/1982No Description Available.
01/06/1982No Description Available.
10/26/1981Record Filed
10/26/1981Case ready to be set
10/26/1981Brief Filed
10/26/1981Brief Filed
10/26/1981Case ready to be set
10/26/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
10/09/1981Notice of Appeal Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/14/2014Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
218th Judicial District Court
Karnes
Honorable J. T. Brite
4,818
8 years