judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals

Case: 08-81-00205-CV
08-81-00205-CV
10/27/1981
Miscellaneous civil
Lincoln Neighborhood Improvement Assn., et al.,
City of El Paso, Texas, et al.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/15/2013Case sent to State Archives
06/05/1984Shuck purged
11/10/1983Mandate Issued
11/02/1983Case Returned from Higher CourtRefused
08/16/1983Case Forwarded to Higher Court
08/11/1983Application for Writ of Error
08/11/1983No description available.
07/13/1983Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
06/29/1983Motion for Rehearing Filed
06/15/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
09/17/1982Submitted
09/15/1982Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/15/1982Order entered
09/09/1982No description available.
07/28/1982Submission
12/31/1981Brief Filed
12/30/1981Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/18/1981Brief Filed
12/18/1981Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
11/25/1981Brief Filed
10/30/1981Supplemental Transcript Filed
10/27/1981Transcript Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/15/2013Case StoredCase archived
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownAppellant
UnknownAppellee
UnknownAppellee
Trial Court Information
205th District Court
El Paso
Honorable Sam W. Callan
81-4526