judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals

Case: 08-81-00206-CV
08-81-00206-CV
10/27/1981
Contract
Malone Oil and Gas Corportion
West Texas Exploration Company
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/05/1984Shuck purged
01/03/1983Mandate Issued
10/20/1982Motion to Withdraw Counsel DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/14/1982Motion to Withdraw Counsel Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/03/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownAppellant
UnknownAppellee
Trial Court Information
161st District Court
Ector
13-61,399