judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals

Case: 08-81-00182-CR
08-81-00182-CR
10/27/1981
Robbery
Oakes, Tommy
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/05/1984Shuck purged
11/04/1982Mandate Issued
09/01/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
08/06/1982Submitted
07/07/1982Submission
05/12/1982Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
04/28/1982No description available.
04/08/1982Brief Filed
03/11/1982Record filed.
10/27/1981Notice of Appeal Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/04/1982Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownCriminal - State of Texas
UnknownCriminal - Appellant
Trial Court Information
210th District Court
El Paso
Honorable Sam M. Paxson
36283
life