judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals

Case: 08-81-00190-CR
08-81-00190-CR
10/27/1981
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Garcia, Karen Najar
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/27/1984Case transferred from this court to another court of appeals
04/27/1984Case transferred from this court to another court of appealsOtherwise Disposed
04/27/1984Submission
04/27/1984Submitted
04/27/1984Case ready to be set
04/26/1984Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
04/09/1984Brief Filed
03/07/1984Order entered
03/16/1983Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/09/1983Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/04/1983Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
02/23/1983Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/22/1983Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
02/11/1983Envelope Filed, showing postmark date
02/11/1983Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
01/26/1983Order entered
09/08/1982Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/23/1982Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
07/07/1982Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/21/1982Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
05/19/1982Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/06/1982Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
04/12/1982Record filed.
10/27/1981Notice of Appeal Filed
10/27/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/27/1984Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownCriminal - State of Texas
UnknownCriminal - Appellant
Trial Court Information
244th District Court
Ector
C-11,996
99 Years