judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 9th Court Of Appeals

Case: 09-81-00051-CV
09-81-00051-CV
11/03/1981
Miscellaneous civil
Mobile America Sales Corp.
Smith, Marvin D.
No
1st Court of Appeals
09/08/1981
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/08/1982Mandate Issued
04/22/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
03/26/1982Submitted
01/26/1982Submission
09/28/1981Brief Filed
09/08/1981No Description Available.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/08/1982Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
23rd District Court
Brazoria
Honorable Larry Gist
81 G 1424