judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals

Case: 04-81-00402-CR
04-81-00402-CR
11/03/1981
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Biegajski, Jr., Arthur John
Texas, The State of
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/20/1983Mandate Issued
10/20/1983Mandate Issued
10/17/1983Case Returned from Higher Court
09/21/1983Higher Court DecisionRefused
09/21/1983Higher Court DecisionRefused
07/18/1983Order Entered
07/18/1983Petition for Review Filed
07/13/1983Case Forwarded to Higher Court
07/08/1983Petition for Review Filed
06/02/1983Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
05/31/1983Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
05/25/1983Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
05/25/1983Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
04/26/1983Motion f/l/file Supp. Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/15/1983Supplemental Brief Filed
04/15/1983Motion f/l/file Supp. Brief Filed
03/02/1983Motion f/l/file Supp. Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/28/1983Motion f/l/file Supp. Brief Filed
08/04/1982Motion f/l/file Supp. Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/29/1982Motion f/l/file Supp. Brief Filed
06/23/1982Submission
06/23/1982Submission
06/23/1982Submitted
06/17/1982Brief Filed
05/25/1982Case ready to be set
05/25/1982Case ready to be set
05/03/1982Brief Filed
03/24/1982Requests Oral Argument
03/17/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/15/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
03/08/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/19/1982Brief Filed
02/11/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
02/03/1982Motion f/l/file Exhibits DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/21/1982Affidavit for Motion Filed
01/21/1982Motion f/l/file Exhibits Filed
01/12/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/06/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
12/08/1981Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion Granted in Part
11/17/1981Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
11/03/1981Record Filed
11/03/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
10/29/1981Record Approved
10/05/1981No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
09/21/1981No Description Available.
04/30/1981Notice of Appeal Filed
03/24/1981Judgment Signed in Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/20/2013Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
10/20/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
229th Judicial District Court
Starr
Honorable Ricardo H. Garcia
80-CR-15
99 Years & $10,000 FINE